FL S1006 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 413 (Ch. 2014-116), CS/CS/HB 415 (Ch. 2014-117)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 413 (Ch. 2014-116), CS/CS/HB 415 (Ch. 2014-117)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Removing provisions relating to the revocation or suspension of a professional license which allow the Office of Financial Regulation to reject an applicant for registration; authorizing the office to conduct examinations and investigations; requiring registrants to report, within a specified time period, a conviction of, or plea of nolo contendere to, a crime or an administrative enforcement action, etc.
Title
Consumer Collection Practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 413 (Ch. 2014-116), CS/CS/HB 415 (Ch. 2014-117) |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 413 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/14 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/22/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/24/14, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/05/14, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1002 (Related) 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 415 (Ch. 2014-117), CS/CS/HB 413 (Ch. 2014-116)
H0413 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 415 (Ch. 2014-117)
H0415 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-117, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 413 (Ch. 2014-116)
H0413 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 415 (Ch. 2014-117)
H0415 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-117, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 413 (Ch. 2014-116)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
559 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 553 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 554 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 5541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 5551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 565 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 730 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |