FL S1002 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 415 (Ch. 2014-117), CS/CS/HB 413 (Ch. 2014-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 415 (Ch. 2014-117), CS/CS/HB 413 (Ch. 2014-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing a public records exemption for information held by the Office of Financial Regulation pursuant to an investigation or examination of consumer collection agencies; providing for future repeal and legislative review of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Office of Financial Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 415 (Ch. 2014-117), CS/CS/HB 413 (Ch. 2014-116) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 415 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/14 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/02/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/26/14, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-10 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/05/14, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1006 (Related) 2014-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 413 (Ch. 2014-116), CS/CS/HB 415 (Ch. 2014-117)
H0415 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-117, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 413 (Ch. 2014-116)
H0413 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 415 (Ch. 2014-117)
H0415 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-117, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 413 (Ch. 2014-116)
H0413 (Similar To) 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 415 (Ch. 2014-117)