FL S0962 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for certain surveillance recordings held by a community development district; providing exceptions; defining the term "resident" of a community development district; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Surveillance Recordings
Sponsors
Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Sen. John Legg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2015-04-01 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/31/15, 10:30 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2015-03-18 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/17/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0537 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar