FL H0537 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for surveillance recordings held by CDD; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Rec./Community Development District Surveillance Recordings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died on Calendar |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable by- Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 2 |
2015-03-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/19/15, 9:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-11 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3 |
2015-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/11/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Now in Government Operations Subcommittee |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable by Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local Government Affairs Subcommittee, 03/03/15, 4:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to Local Government Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0962 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Rules