FL S0630 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting insurance policies from providing specified rights of subrogation under certain circumstances; authorizing a condominium association to extinguish discriminatory restrictions; providing requirements for natural gas fuel stations on property governed by condominium associations; authorizing parties to initiate presuit mediation under certain circumstances; revising the allowable uses of certain escrow funds withdrawn by developers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Associations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-18SenateNow in Community Affairs
2021-02-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-02-16SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/16/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
2021-01-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S56 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
S872 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Introduced
H615 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
H665 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
H867 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
H1005 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S1490 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Referred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
H1259 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S1688 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Filed
H1517 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S1966 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Filed
S1998 (Similar To) 2021-03-01 - Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7181255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7181265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7185014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719128Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7203075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720316Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback