FL H1005 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides & revises condominium association recordkeeping requirements; provides alternative methods & requirements for investment of association funds; provides how earnings, rather than interest, that accrue on reserve funds may be used; excludes contracts for registered investment advisor services from certain requirements.
Title
Investment of Condominium Association Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-25 | House | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H615 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 56 (Ch. 2021-91), CS/CS/SB 630 (Ch. 2021-99)
H867 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, Refer to CS/CS/SB 630, 1st Eng.
S56 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-91, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 630 (Ch. 2021-99)
S630 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-99, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 56 (Ch. 2021-91), CS/CS/SB 1966 (Ch. 2021-135)
S1490 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 56 (Ch. 2021-91), CS/CS/SB 630 (Ch. 2021-99)
H867 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, Refer to CS/CS/SB 630, 1st Eng.
S56 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-91, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 630 (Ch. 2021-99)
S630 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-99, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 56 (Ch. 2021-91), CS/CS/SB 1966 (Ch. 2021-135)
S1490 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 56 (Ch. 2021-91), CS/CS/SB 630 (Ch. 2021-99)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 3026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1005 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1005/BillText/Filed/PDF |