FL S0056 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-26 - On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/03/21, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building
Pending: Senate Community Affairs Committee
Hearing: Mar 3 @ 9:30 am in 37 Senate Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring condominium associations to maintain specified affirmative acknowledgments as official records of the association; revising timeframes for foreclosure judgments; requiring condominium associations to deliver certain statements of account to unit owners in a specified manner; requiring condominium associations to give notice to unit owners before changing the method of delivery for the statements of account; requiring cooperative associations to maintain specified affirmative acknowledgments as official records of the association, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Association Assessment Notices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/03/21, 9:30 am, 37 Senate Building
2021-01-26SenateNow in Community Affairs
2021-01-26SenateFavorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-01-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/26/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
2021-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S630 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Now in Community Affairs
H615 (Same As) 2021-02-18 - Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H867 (Similar To) 2021-02-22 - Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
H1005 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
S1490 (Similar To) 2021-02-22 - Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
718111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7203085Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback