FL H0867 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Added to Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises & provides requirements relating to community associations, including contracts, documents, records, assessments, fines, liens, improvements, online voting, electronic notice, natural gas fueling stations, election of board members, alternative dispute resolution, governing documents, emergency powers, & escrow funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Associations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-01HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-03-30House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-03-30HouseCS Filed
2021-03-30HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-30HouseReported out of Judiciary Committee
2021-03-29HouseFavorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
2021-03-25HouseAdded to Judiciary Committee agenda
2021-03-24HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2021-03-24HouseReported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-03-24HouseFavorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseAdded to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-12HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-03-12HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-03-12HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-03-11House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-10HouseCS Filed
2021-03-10HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-10HouseReported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-03-10HouseFavorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-03-08HouseAdded to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-22HouseNow in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-02-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S630 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - In Messages
H615 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Added to Second Reading Calendar
H665 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - In Messages
S56 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - In Messages
S872 (Similar To) 2021-03-24 - Now in Rules
H1005 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S1490 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Now in Rules
H1259 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S1688 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Introduced
H1517 (Similar To) 2021-04-16 - Added to Second Reading Calendar
S1966 (Similar To) 2021-04-16 - Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
S1998 (Similar To) 2021-03-10 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7181255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7181265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7185014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719128Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7203075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720316Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/867
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/867/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/867/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/867/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/867/Amendment/832133/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/867/Analyses/h0867.CIV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/867/Analyses/h0867a.CIV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/867/Analyses/h0867b.RRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/867/Analyses/h0867c.RRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/867/Analyses/h0867d.JDC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/867/Analyses/h0867e.JDC.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback