FL H0615 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 56 (Ch. 2021-91), CS/CS/SB 630 (Ch. 2021-99)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to condominium, cooperative, & homeowner's associations, including requiring affirmative acknowledgments for certain actions, specified notices to unit & parcel owners, delivery of certain invoices & account statements, & timeframes for foreclosure judgments and liens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Association Assessment Notices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseLaid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 56 (Ch. 2021-91), CS/CS/SB 630 (Ch. 2021-99)
2021-04-06HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-06HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-04-06HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-06HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2021-04-02HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-30HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-03-30HouseReported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseFavorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-03-26HouseAdded to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-10HouseNow in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-03-10HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-10HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-03-10House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-09HouseCS Filed
2021-03-09HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-09HouseReported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-03-08HouseFavorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-03-04HouseAdded to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-18HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-02-18HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-01-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S56 (Same As) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-91, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 630 (Ch. 2021-99)
S630 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-99, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 56 (Ch. 2021-91), CS/CS/SB 1966 (Ch. 2021-135)
H867 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, Refer to CS/CS/SB 630, 1st Eng.
H1005 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
S1490 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 56 (Ch. 2021-91), CS/CS/SB 630 (Ch. 2021-99)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
718111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718116Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7203085Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/615
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/615/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/615/BillText/c1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/615/Amendment/910617/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/615/Analyses/h0615.RRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/615/Analyses/h0615a.RRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/615/Analyses/h0615b.CIV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/615/Analyses/h0615c.CIV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/615/Analyses/h0615d.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/615/Analyses/h0615e.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/615/Analyses/h0615z.RRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/615/Analyses/h0615z1.RRS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57448&IsPCB=0&BillId=70932
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59591&IsPCB=0&BillId=70932
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60076&IsPCB=0&BillId=70932

Bill Comments 750

feedback