FL H9387 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Taylor County School District Safe and Secure Schools Electronic Access Control Key System.
Title
Taylor County School District Safe and Secure Schools Electronic Access Control Key System
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Shoaf [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-27 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2022-01-12 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-08 | House | Filed |