FL H7103 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-165, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 207 (Ch. 2019-106)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a county to provide certain incentives to fully offset all costs to the developer of its affordable housing contribution; requiring that a county review the application for completeness and issue a certain letter within a specified period after receiving an application for approval of a development permit or development order; requiring the holder of certain impact fee credits to be entitled to a certain benefit if a local government increases its impact fee rates; requiring condominium associations to ensure compliance with the Florida Fire Prevention Code, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Development and Housing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#380 (Y: 66 N: 42 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#228 (Y: 72 N: 37 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Chapter No. 2019-165, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 207 (Ch. 2019-106)
2019-06-28 Approved by Governor
2019-06-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-03HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 66 NAYS 42
2019-05-03HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (444806) 1289
2019-05-03HouseAmendment(s) failed (396347)
2019-05-03HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 26 NAYS 13
2019-05-03SenateAmendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (444806)
2019-05-03SenateMotion to reconsider adopted
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-02SenateAmendment(s) adopted (387652)
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/CS/SB 1730
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-02SenateWithdrawn from Community Affairs; Rules
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Rules
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 72 NAYS 37
2019-04-25HouseAmendment(s) adopted (250551)
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24HouseAmendment(s) adopted (726475, 773351)
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-12HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-04-12HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-10HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 8
2019-04-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/10/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-04-05HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-04-04HouseCS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time
2019-04-04HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-03HouseCS by Judiciary Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 7
2019-04-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-26HouseIntroduced
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-03-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1730 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 207 (Ch. 2019-106), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S616 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
H207 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-106, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S144 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 207 (Ch. 2019-106), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
H291 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
H1155 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
H1299 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S250 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S350 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S428 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
H647 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
H723 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S908 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S1152 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S1732 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12501055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
125022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633180Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16331801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16604151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
171042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
252363Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
420503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4205095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
553791Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7181085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718112Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/BillText/e2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/BillText/e3/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/Amendment/570747/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/Amendment/185001/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/Amendment/538061/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/Amendment/773351/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/Amendment/726475/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/Vote/HouseVote_h07103e1228.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/Vote/SenateVote_h07103e2015.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/7103/Vote/HouseVote_h07103e2380.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback