FL H0723 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes local authorities to accept inspection reports by specified means; requires State Fire Marshal to adopt rules to implement uniform procedure for submission of inspection reports & provides requirements therefor; requires association to retrofit certain condominiums with fire sprinkler system or Engineered Life Safety System; provides compliance deadlines; authorizes association to elect alternative assessment option while implementing qualifying fire protection improvement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fire Protection Systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Commerce Committee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-10HouseCS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-04-10HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-04-09HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/09/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-27HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 2
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H647 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages
S908 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 647
S1152 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
S1732 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H1393 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
S1704 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1393
H7103 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718120Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback