FL H1393 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-140, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1024 (Ch. 2019-52)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-140, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1024 (Ch. 2019-52)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Treasury to maintain certain warrants rather than turning them over to the Division of Accounting and Auditing; providing requirements for a combination license as funeral director and embalmer; revising the requirements for a funeral establishment and the requirements and responsibilities of a funeral director in charge; requiring preneed licensees, under certain circumstances, to provide certain persons with a written notice of intent to distribute funds under the preneed contract; establishing the Florida Blockchain Task Force within the department, etc.
Title
Department of Financial Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#347 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#254 (Y: 101 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#254 (Y: 101 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Chapter No. 2019-140, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1024 (Ch. 2019-52) | |
2019-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-25 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-01 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2019-05-01 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 2 |
2019-05-01 | House | Concurred in 3 amendment(s) (141036, 697136, 701988) 1123 |
2019-04-30 | House | In returning messages |
2019-04-30 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 3 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (141036, 697136, 701988) 610 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1704 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-25 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 101 NAYS 11 |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (487331, 543111, 637373) 887 |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-22 | House | CS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19 |
2019-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-22 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-18 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/18/19, 8:15 am, Webster Hall |
2019-04-03 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-04-01 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-01 | House | CS/CS by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/01/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-25 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-25 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-19 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1704 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140)
H723 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S908 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S1204 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H735 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1024 (Ch. 2019-52), CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140)
S1024 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Chapter No. 2019-52, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140)
H723 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S908 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S1204 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H735 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1024 (Ch. 2019-52), CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140)
S1024 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Chapter No. 2019-52, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 1565 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 266 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 376 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 377 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 380 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 452 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 453 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 458 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 464 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 7921 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 2815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 471 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 6215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 729 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 7355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8437 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 844 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 748 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 218 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 520 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |