FL S1704 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Treasury to maintain, rather than turn over to the Division of Accounting and Auditing, warrants drawn by the Chief Financial Officer; deleting a requirement that trust companies, where certain care and maintenance trust funds may be established, must operate pursuant to ch. 660, F.S.; revising requirements for the supervision of licensed funeral establishments by funeral directors in charge; deleting an examination requirement for an applicant for an industrial fire insurance or burglary insurance license, etc.
Title
Department of Financial Services
Sponsors
Senate Innovation, Industry, and Technology Committee | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Sen. Tommy Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time 608 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | CS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2019-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | CS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 04/10/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2019-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1393 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-140, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1024 (Ch. 2019-52)
H723 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S908 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
H723 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S908 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1393 (Ch. 2019-140), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 173 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 266 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 376 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 377 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 380 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 452 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 453 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 458 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 464 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 7921 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 2815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 471 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 6215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 729 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 7355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8437 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 844 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
626 | 8732 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 7015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 216 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 218 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 520 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
717 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |