FL H0647 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
Pending: House Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Mar 26 @ 12:00 pm in Morris Hall
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain associations to post certain signs or symbols on buildings; requires State Fire Marshal to adopt rules governing such signs & symbols; provides for enforcement; revises provisions relating to evidence of association compliance with fire & life safety code; revises provisions related to retrofitting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Association Fire and Life Safety Systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-06HouseNow in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-06HouseFavorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 7
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 3:15 pm, Webster Hall
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-02-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H723 (Similar To) 2019-03-22 - On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall
S908 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
S1152 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Now in Community Affairs
S1732 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6332225Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7191055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback