DC B25-0247 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 25-247 would prohibit female genital mutilation of a person under care, and expand mandated reporter reporting requirements to include female genital mutilation. It would also provide for a civil action for female genital mutilation.
Title
Female Genital Mutilation Prohibition Act of 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Matthew Frumin [D] | Cnc. Christina Henderson [I] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-06-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-06-09 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-05-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-04-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0247 Published in the DC Register |
2023-04-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0247 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/52824/Introduction/B25-0247-Introduction.pdf |