CA AB2343 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 958, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 958, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10372.3 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
CalWORKs: childcare programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2343 Schiavo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2343 Schiavo By Menjivar (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2343 Schiavo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2343 Schiavo By Menjivar (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - AB 2343 Schiavo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 958, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2024-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-07-03 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5444.) |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10372.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |