LA HB575 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the membership of the Orleans Parish Communications District
Title
Provides relative to the membership of the Orleans Parish Communications District
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 575 FINAL PASSAGE (#736) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2024. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |