FL S1730 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 207 (Ch. 2019-106), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing an inclusionary housing ordinance to require a developer to provide a specified number or percentage of affordable housing units to be included in a development or allow a developer to contribute to a housing fund or other alternatives; requiring that a county review the application for completeness and issue a certain letter within a specified period after receiving an application for approval of a development permit or development order; providing requirements for a comprehensive plan adopted after a specified date and all land development regulations adopted to implement the comprehensive plan, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Development and Housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 207 (Ch. 2019-106), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
2019-05-02SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 7103
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/19
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-25SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2019-04-25SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-23SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 6
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-16SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2019-04-11SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-09SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 1
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 04/09/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-27SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2019-03-27SenateNow in Infrastructure and Security
2019-03-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-20SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H207 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-106, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S144 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 207 (Ch. 2019-106), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S1632 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Banking and Insurance
H7103 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-165, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 207 (Ch. 2019-106)
H291 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S350 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S428 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12501055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
125022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633180Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16331801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1633202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16604151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
494001Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback