FL H0207 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-106, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises minimum requirements for adoption of impact fees by specified local governments; exempts water & sewer connection fees from Florida Impact Fee Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Impact Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#32 (Y: 101 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18 Chapter No. 2019-106, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
2019-06-18 Approved by Governor
2019-06-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-10HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-04SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 1
2019-04-04SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-04SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-04SenateSubstituted for SB 144
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-04SenateWithdrawn from Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateReceived
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateIn Messages
2019-03-27HouseCS passed; YEAS 101 NAYS 12
2019-03-27HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-27HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-14HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/14/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-05HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-05HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/05/19, 4:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-02-25HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2019-02-21HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-02-21HouseCS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 02/20/19, 4:00 pm, 12 HOB
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S144 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 207 (Ch. 2019-106), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
S1730 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 207 (Ch. 2019-106), CS/CS/HB 7103 (Ch. 2019-165)
H7103 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-165, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 207 (Ch. 2019-106)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16331801Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback