FL H1289 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Enrolled on April 29 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Message sent to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes operation of low-speed autonomous delivery vehicle on certain streets & roads; authorizes operation of low-speed autonomous delivery vehicle on streets or roads with posted speed limit of up to 45 miles per hour under specified conditions; provides requirements for low-speed autonomous delivery vehicles; provides certain fully autonomous vehicles are not subject to certain provisions of law or regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autonomous Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#431 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#45 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#267 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-29HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2021-04-29HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
2021-04-29HouseAmendment 597986 Concur
2021-04-29HouseAmendment 812490 Concur
2021-04-29HouseAdded to Senate Message List
2021-04-26HouseIn Messages
2021-04-26SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 1
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-26SenateAmendment(s) adopted (597986, 812490)
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-26SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1620
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2021-04-23SenateReceived
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Rules
2021-04-23HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-23SenateIn Messages
2021-04-23HouseCS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
2021-04-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-22HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-22HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-22HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-19HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/22/2021)
2021-04-16HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-16HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-15House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-04-15HouseCS Filed
2021-04-15HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-15HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-04-14HouseFavorable with CS by Commerce Committee
2021-04-12HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-04-02HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-04-02HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-04-01House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-04-01HouseCS Filed
2021-04-01HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-01HouseReported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseAdded to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-28HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-28HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1620 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1289
H817 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S138 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162122Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
655960Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/Amendment/978767/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/Amendment/308333/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/Amendment/812490/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/Amendment/597986/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/Analyses/h1289.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/Analyses/h1289a.TIE.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/Analyses/h1289b.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/Analyses/h1289c.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/Analyses/h1289z.TIE.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/Vote/HouseVote_h01289c2267.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/Vote/SenateVote_h01289c2045.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1289/Vote/HouseVote_h01289c2431.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59718&IsPCB=0&BillId=72447
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60291&IsPCB=0&BillId=72447

Bill Comments 750

feedback