CA ACR209 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-16)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-03 - From committee: Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 2024 International Day of Yoga.
Title
The 2024 International Day of Yoga.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-20 - Assembly - ACR 209 Kalra Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-24 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0.) |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2024-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-06-05 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |