FL S0138 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on December 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Now in Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the principles relating to mobility which the department's goals are required to address; requiring that certain funds be used for specified purposes relating to the Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Grant Program, beginning in a specified year; requiring the department to establish the Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Grant Program; providing for the distribution of grants to certain entities to install electric vehicle charging infrastructure; requiring the department to coordinate, develop, and recommend a supplemental master plan to address innovations in electric vehicle charging station infrastructure and the development of high-powered charging infrastructure for electric aircraft; prohibiting certain rules adopted by the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services from requiring specific methods of sale for electric vehicle charging equipment used and services provided in this state, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-23SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2021-03-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 03/23/21, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-16SenateCS by Transportation read 1st time
2021-03-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2021-03-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-10SenateCS by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2021-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2020-12-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S140 (Related) 2021-03-25 - Now in Appropriations
H817 (Same As) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
H819 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3390802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339286Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339287Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36694Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback