FL H0817 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes DOT to adopt rules; revises DOT's goals relating to mobility; requires that certain funds be used for specified purposes relating to Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Grant Program; requires that certain funds remain in State Transportation Trust Fund; requires DOT to establish program; provides for distribution of grants to certain entities to install electric vehicle charging infrastructure; provides grant requirements; provides requirements for equipment installed using grant funds; provides duties of DOT; authorizes DOT to develop model plan for local governments; requires DOT to adopt rules; specifies that certain rules adopted by DACS may not require specific methods of sale for electric vehicle charging equipment used in, & services provided in, this state; provides appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-22HouseNow in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H819 (Related) 2021-03-02 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
S138 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Now in Appropriations
S140 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Now in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3390802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339286Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36694Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback