FL S1620 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1289 (Ch. 2021-233)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1289 (Ch. 2021-233)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "low-speed autonomous delivery vehicle"; authorizing the operation of a low-speed autonomous delivery vehicle on certain streets and roads; authorizing the operation of a low-speed autonomous delivery vehicle on streets or roads with a posted speed limit of up to 45 miles per hour under specified conditions; providing requirements for low-speed autonomous delivery vehicles; providing that certain fully autonomous vehicles are not subject to certain provisions of law or regulations, etc.
Title
Autonomous Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1289 (Ch. 2021-233) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1289 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/24/21, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-16 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-10 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1289 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-233
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 960 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |