FL H1259 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises qualifications to register to vote; authorizes person who has been convicted of felony & has served his or her sentence to preregister to vote; authorizes DHSMV to automatically register to vote or update voter registration record of eligible individual; requires DHSMV to notify individual that certain information gathered for completion of driver license or identification card application, renewal, or change of address is automatically transferred to voter registration application or used to update voter registration record; requires that applicant who fails to designate party affiliation be registered without party affiliation; revises requirements of statewide voter registration system; requires DOS to develop system that allows eligible citizens to register to vote online; authorizes elector to vote regular ballot at polling place in precinct to which he or she has moved by completing affirmation.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Ethics and Elections Subcommittee; Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0888 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H0025 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H1045 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0080 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0234 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S0388 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S1198 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H0025 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H1045 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0080 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0234 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S0388 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S1198 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1259 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1259/BillText/Filed/PDF |