FL S1198 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing an elector who changes his or her legal residence to vote in the precinct to which he or she has moved even if the change of residence is not within the same county; limiting the ballot summary of a joint resolution to 75 words in length; deleting a presumption that a ballot statement consisting of the full text of an amendment or revision is a clear and unambiguous statement of the substance and effect of the measure; revising and expanding locations that may be designated as early voting sites, etc.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Sachs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Judiciary; Rules |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1045 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H0025 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H0397 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H0449 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee
H1259 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee
S0080 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0082 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0388 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0600 (Similar To) 2013-04-16 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0668 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0782 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S0888 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H7013 (Similar To) 2013-05-21 - Chapter No. 2013-57
H0025 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H0397 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H0449 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee
H1259 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee
S0080 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0082 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0388 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0600 (Similar To) 2013-04-16 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0668 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0782 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S0888 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
H7013 (Similar To) 2013-05-21 - Chapter No. 2013-57
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1198 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1198/BillText/Filed/HTML |