FL S0888 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the qualifications to register to vote; authorizing a person who has been convicted of a felony and has served his or her sentence to preregister to vote; authorizing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to automatically register to vote or update a voter registration record of an eligible individual; authorizing an elector to vote a regular ballot at the polling place in the precinct to which he or she has moved by completing an affirmation, etc.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Transportation; Appropriations; Rules |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1259 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee
H0025 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H1045 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0080 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0234 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S0388 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S1198 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H0025 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
H1045 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0080 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S0234 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S0388 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
S1198 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7013 (Ch. 2013-57)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/888 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/0888/BillText/Filed/HTML |