FL H0831 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes exiled professional to substitute specified lawful practice of profession for education requirement of the examination; requires such education to be from accredited college or university; revises education requirements for licensure to include an applicant who has received an associate degree; provides that specified experience or completion of specified apprenticeship program may be substituted for education requirements for licensure as land surveyor or mapper; provides applicant who holds license from another state, jurisdiction, or territory, & has certain experience in practice of surveying & mapping may take licensure examination to practice as land surveyor or mapper in this state.
Title
Licensure Requirements for Land Surveyors and Mappers
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | Rep. Amber Mariano [R] | Rep. Lawrence McClure [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died on Second Reading Calendar |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-04 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-02 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-02 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2022-01-25 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | Original reference removed: Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-21 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-21 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-21 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-20 | House | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-01-18 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-16 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-16 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-12-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1286 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
472 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 0101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |