FL S1286 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing an exiled professional to substitute a specified lawful practice of the profession for the education requirement of the examination; revising education requirements for licensure to include an applicant who has received an associate degree under certain circumstances; requiring such education to be from an accredited college or university; providing that specified experience entitles an applicant to take the licensure examination for licensure as a land surveyor or mapper; providing that an applicant who holds a valid license from another state, jurisdiction, or territory, and has certain experience in the practice of surveying and mapping may take the licensure examination to practice as a land surveyor or mapper in this state, etc.
Title
Licensure Requirements For land Surveyors And Mappers
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Education; Rules |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H831 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
472 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 0101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
472 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1286 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1286/BillText/Filed/HTML |