FL H0073 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides & revises honorary designations of various transportation facilities in specified counties; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193) |
2017-05-02 | House | Substituted CS/CS/SB 368 |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-04-27 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | CS/CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-19 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/19/17, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-28 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-02-22 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/22/17, 8:00 am, 116 Knott Building |
2017-02-13 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-02-08 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 02/08/17, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2016-12-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0368 (Similar To) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-193
H0123 (Similar To) 2017-01-26 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H225 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S480 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S576 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H633 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S770 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H1071 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H0123 (Similar To) 2017-01-26 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H225 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S480 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S576 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H633 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S770 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H1071 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)