FL S0368 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-193
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-193
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing honorary designations of various transportation facilities in specified counties; directing the department to erect signage in specified counties to commemorate certain conflicts involving the United States Armed Forces, etc.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Transportation Committee | Sen. Bill Montford [D] | Sen. Daphne Campbell [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#413 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Chapter No. 2017-193 | |
2017-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-31 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-03 | House | CS passed; YEAS 120 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 73 |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Received |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | In Messages |
2017-04-27 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 34 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (386684) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/17 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/20/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/13/17, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/21/17, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0073 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S0576 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S0770 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H225 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S480 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H633 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H1071 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S1374 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H123 (Similar To) 2017-01-26 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S0576 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S0770 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H225 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Government Accountability Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S480 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H633 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H1071 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S1374 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H123 (Similar To) 2017-01-26 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)