FL H0123 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Historic Suwannee River Scenic Parkway in Hamilton and Suwannee Counties; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193) |
2017-01-26 | House | Withdrawn from Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2016-12-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0073 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
S368 (Similar To) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-193
S368 (Similar To) 2017-06-28 - Chapter No. 2017-193
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/123 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0123/BillText/Filed/PDF |