FL H0023 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that certain not-for-profit corporations may act as agent on behalf of principal under power of attorney; provides qualifications; provides that person acting on behalf of corporation in its role as agent under power of attorney has fiduciary responsibility to principal.
Title
Powers of Attorney
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2016-01-12 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-10-28 | House | Now in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2015-10-21 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-10-20 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-10-13 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 10/20/15, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2015-08-27 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-08-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0362 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/23 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0023/BillText/Filed/PDF |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0023/BillText/c1/PDF |