CT SJ00028 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Glenn Powell, Esquire Of Collinsville To Be A Member Of The State Department Of Education Arbitration Panel.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Glenn Powell, Esquire Of Collinsville To Be A Member Of The State Department Of Education Arbitration Panel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 71 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Adopted, House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | House Calendar Number 122 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 67 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |