CT SB01151 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Calendar Number 580
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Calendar Number 580
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To facilitate former offenders becoming productive members of society by providing that a provisional pardon will automatically become an absolute pardon after the passage of a certain period of time.
Title
An Act Concerning Special Provisional Pardons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 312 PASS (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | House Calendar Number 580 | |
2011-06-01 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-31 | Senate Passed | |
2011-05-03 | File Number 731 | |
2011-05-03 | Senate Calendar Number 446 | |
2011-05-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-14 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-17 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |