CT SB00993 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - House Calendar Number 536
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-23 - House Calendar Number 536
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide for the advertising of certain farming on highway signs.
Title
An Act Concerning Fair Advertising For Connecticut Agricultural Tourism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 205 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | House Calendar Number 536 | |
2011-05-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-19 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6313 | |
2011-04-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-21 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | |
2011-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-04-04 | File Number 333 | |
2011-04-04 | Senate Calendar Number 217 | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-28 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-18 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |