CT SB00448 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - File Number 530
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - File Number 530
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a working group to study existing tax expenditures in the state for the purpose of simplifying the state tax code.
Title
An Act Concerning A Working Group To Examine Existing Tax Expenditures In The State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | File Number 530 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 308 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/28 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |