CT HB06514 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Concerning Incentives For Qualified Data Centers To Locate In The State.
Title
An Act Concerning Incentives For Qualified Data Centers To Locate In The State.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Ritter [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Jason Rojas [D] | Sen. Robert Duff [D] |
Rep. Eleni Kavros DeGraw [D] | Rep. Christine Conley [D] | Sen. Heather Bond Somers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 44 PASS (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 11 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Roll Call Vote 11 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Public Act 21-1 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor in Original |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Governor |
2021-03-01 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 45 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | House Passed |
2021-02-23 | House | Emergency Certification |