CT HB06364 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To extend the sunset date for personal risk insurance filings and prohibit an insurer that discontinues accepting applications for a line or subline of personal risk insurance in this state from filing a rate increase for such line or subline of more than six per cent.
Title
An Act Concerning The Sunset Date For Personal Risk Insurance Rate Filings And The Procurement Of Reinsurance By Domestic Title Insurers.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] | House Insurance and Real Estate Committee | Rep. Susan Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 545 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 297 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 297 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-07-01 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-30 | Public Act 11-253 | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Calendar Number 658 | |
2011-06-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-06-06 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2011-06-06 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | |
2011-06-06 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8365 | |
2011-06-06 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6586 | |
2011-03-28 | File Number 245 | |
2011-03-28 | House Calendar Number 156 | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-03-28 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |