CT HB06262 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To maintain the current distribution of funds for certain state agricultural and farming programs.
Title
An Act Concerning The Performance Of Certain Federal Requirements By The Connecticut Milk Promotion Board.
Sponsors
House Environment Committee | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] | Rep. Noreen Kokoruda [R] |
Rep. Terrie Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 544 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 296 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 296 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-07-01 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-30 | Public Act 11-249 | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Calendar Number 657 | |
2011-06-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-06-06 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2011-06-06 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-06 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8431 | |
2011-05-03 | File Number 706 | |
2011-05-03 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-03 | New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-05-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-18 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-04-12 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-04-05 | File Number 387 | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-05 | House Calendar Number 235 | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-22 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-18 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-03 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |