CT HB05412 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To name the Troop K State Police Barracks in honor of late State Representative Linda A. Orange.
Title
An Act Naming The Troop K State Police Barracks In Colchester In Honor Of Linda A. Orange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 344 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 206 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 206 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-16 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-16 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-15 | House | Special Act 21-11 |
2021-06-04 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2021-06-04 | House | Senate Passed |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate Calendar Number 522 |
2021-05-28 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-26 | House | House Passed |
2021-03-16 | House | File Number 48 |
2021-03-16 | House | House Calendar Number 71 |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-05 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable |
2021-02-05 | House | Public Hearing 02/11 |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
2021-02-03 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2021-01-28 | House | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |