CT HB05291 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - File Number 596
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-27 - File Number 596
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To raise the minimum wage and base future raises on the consumer price index, remove the tip credit, and increase penalties for failure to pay the minimum wage.
Title
An Act Concerning The Minimum Wage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 136 AS AMENDED (Y: 88 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 135 LCO # 4029 (Y: 52 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 134 LCO # 3963 (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 135 LCO # 4029 (Y: 52 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-04-26 - House - House Roll Call Vote 134 LCO # 3963 (Y: 91 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | File Number 596 | |
2012-04-27 | Senate Calendar Number 433 | |
2012-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-26 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-26 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 4029 | |
2012-04-26 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 4002 | |
2012-04-26 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3963 | |
2012-04-16 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-16 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-13 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-27 | File Number 141 | |
2012-03-27 | House Calendar Number 120 | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-21 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-15 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |