CT HB05149 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-03 - Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To amend certain minimum fair wage guidelines.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Minimum Fair Wage Provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2017-03-02 | House | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Vote to Draft |
2017-02-09 | House | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-04 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |