AZ HB2210 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
College-readiness exam; pilot program
Title
College-readiness exam; pilot program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-2-2-0) |
2017-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-22 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (12-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-02-16 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | House ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |