WV SB59 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - To House Workforce Development
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - To House Workforce Development
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring work search activities to qualify for unemployment benefits
Title
Requiring work search activities to qualify for unemployment benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] | Sen. Mark Hunt [D] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-23 - Senate - Effective January 1, 2024 (Roll No. 59) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 59) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 59) (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | To House Workforce Development |
2023-02-14 | House | To Workforce Development then Finance |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Effective January 1, 2024 (Roll No. 59) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 59) |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-01-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-01-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-01-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2589 (Similar To) 2023-01-16 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21A | 2D | 2a | New Code | See Bill Text |
21A | 3 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21A | 3 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21A | 3 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21A | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21A | 6 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21A | 6 | 1D | New Code | See Bill Text |