WV SB58 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 42, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 42, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to basis for voidable marriages and annulments
Title
Relating to basis for voidable marriages and annulments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 257) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 12) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 231) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 12) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 231) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 42, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/14/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/14/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/13/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-13 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/14 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-05 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 257) |
2014-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 12) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-28 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 231) |
2014-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-27 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-25 | House | Do pass |
2014-01-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-01-27 | House | To Judiciary |
2014-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-01-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-01-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-01-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 3 | 103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
48 | 3 | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |