WV SB450 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Collecting and analyzing statistical information pertaining to terminating pregnancies under Medicaid Program
Title
Collecting and analyzing statistical information pertaining to terminating pregnancies under Medicaid Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 155) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2018-02-21 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2018-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 155) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-09 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-01 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |