WV SB399 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing personal and corporate income tax credits for farmers donating edible agricultural products
Title
Establishing personal and corporate income tax credits for farmers donating edible agricultural products
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Karnes [R] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Bob Williams [D] | Sen. Kent Leonhardt [R] |
Sen. John Unger [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 220) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | To House Finance |
2016-03-01 | House | To Finance |
2016-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 220) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/28/16 |
2016-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2016-01-27 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-27 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development then Finance |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB418 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13DD | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |