WV SB362 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-25 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-25 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to incrementally redistribute an existing excise tax on the transfer of real property so that, over the course of five years, all moneys collected will be paid to the county where the property is situate instead of the state and to require that moneys paid to counties be exclusively dedicated to regional jails.
Title
Dedicating proceeds from county excise tax on transfer of real property to regional jails
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-02-25 | Senate | To Government Organization then Finance |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2308 (Similar To) 2013-02-13 - To House Judiciary
SB141 (Similar To) 2013-02-13 - To Government Organization
HB4250 (Same As)
HB2710 (Similar To) 2013-03-29 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 2689
HB2790 (Similar To) 2013-03-19 - To House Finance
SB141 (Similar To) 2013-02-13 - To Government Organization
HB4250 (Same As)
HB2710 (Similar To) 2013-03-29 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 2689
HB2790 (Similar To) 2013-03-19 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 22 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39A | 4 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39A | 4 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39A | 4 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39A | 4 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39A | 4 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39A | 4 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39A | 4 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |